Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1981 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19784 Week
» 72800 Month
» 192327 Year
» 3219180 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5802 |
on |
07/01/1933 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
58xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
279 |
To Service |
Mon 07/01/1933 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 29/12/1958 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
07/01/1933 |
SDN |
|
Swindon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/12/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/01/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5802 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
29/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5802 |
|
|
03/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|