Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 848 Today
» 5975 Yesterday
» 6823 Week
» 105468 Month
» 308132 Year
» 3334985 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5803 |
22/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31273 |
17/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
22/06/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/08/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1974 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
01/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
06/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
by 04/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5803 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 304 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
10/08/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
17/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31273 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/04/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31273 |
|
|
05/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|