Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5803 |
on |
10/01/1933 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
58xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
279 |
To Service |
Tue 10/01/1933 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 02/07/1957 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys |
Total Mileage |
413,454 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
10/01/1933 |
BRD |
|
Bristol Bath Road |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
OSW |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1948 |
81F |
|
Oxford |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
89C |
|
Machynlleth |
4w/e |
18/06/1955 |
|
|
Stored |
on |
08/08/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/07/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
OSW |
|
m/e |
31/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
81F |
Oxford |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
89C |
Machynlleth |
4w/e |
18/06/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/01/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5803 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (BRD) |
|
|
31/05/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
08/08/1956 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
02/07/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5803 |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|