Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 174 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17977 Week
» 70993 Month
» 190520 Year
» 3217373 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5804 |
29/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31274 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31425 |
30/09/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
29/06/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5804 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 305 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
22/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31274 |
|
|
18/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
30/09/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31425 |
|
|
01/09/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31425 |
|
|
06/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|