Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 270 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2177 Week
» 20959 Month
» 269252 Year
» 1153633 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5804 29/06/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31274 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/229/06/1961
31/103/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 305
Cost when Built £
To Service 29/06/1961
Withdrawn 01/09/1991
Time in Service 30 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 06/1994
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 29/06/1961
31B March w/e 25/11/1961
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 27/04/1963
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
41C Wath w/e 22/01/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 18/06/1966
51L Thornaby w/e 11/11/1972
TI Tinsley w/e 18/05/1974
   Withdrawn 01/09/1991

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/06/1961 To Service To service as D5804
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 305
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
25/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
27/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
22/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
03/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31274    
18/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
01/09/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31274    
06/1994 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev