Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 8 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2869 Week
» 21651 Month
» 269944 Year
» 1154325 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5805 06/07/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31275 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/206/07/1961
31/124/09/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 306
Cost when Built £
To Service 06/07/1961
Withdrawn 31/01/2005
Time in Service 43 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys
Cut Up 02/2005
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 06/07/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
91M To London Midland Region w/e 25/09/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 16/10/1965
91M To London Midland Region w/e 23/10/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 06/11/1965
41C Wath w/e 22/01/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 18/06/1966
51L Thornaby w/e 11/11/1972
IM Immingham w/e 12/01/1974
TI Tinsley 3w/e 12/07/1975
   Withdrawn 31/01/2005


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/07/1961 To Service To service as D5805
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 306
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
25/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
16/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
23/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
22/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31275    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
12/07/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
31/01/2005 Withdrawn Condemned as 31275    
02/2005 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carnforth    

prev prev