Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 192 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1291 Week
» 7425 Month
» 235309 Year
» 1456874 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5806 13/07/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 31276 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/213/07/1961
31/102/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 307
To Service 13/07/1961
Withdrawn 11/02/2000
Time in Service 38 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 03/2000
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 13/07/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
41C Wath w/e 22/01/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 18/06/1966
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 22/01/1972
41A Tinsley w/e 29/01/1972
   Withdrawn 11/02/2000

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 41A Tinsley 5w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 41C Wath 4w/e 29/01/1966
ALLOC 41A Tinsley 4w/e 02/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
02/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
06/1969   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/07/1961 To Service To service as D5806
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 307
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
22/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
02/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
06/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
22/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
29/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31276    
11/02/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31276    
03/2000 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev