Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 177 Today
» 977 Yesterday
» 4173 Week
» 11357 Month
» 319338 Year
» 1203719 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5807 20/07/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31277 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/220/07/1961
31/107/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 308
Cost when Built £
To Service 20/07/1961
Withdrawn 01/02/1995
Time in Service 33 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 06/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 20/07/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 23/04/1966
52A Gateshead w/e 05/08/1972
51L Thornaby w/e 12/08/1972
   Withdrawn 01/02/1995

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
07/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/07/1961 To Service To service as D5807
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 308
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
07/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
05/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31277    
01/02/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31277    
06/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev