Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 523 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2430 Week
» 21212 Month
» 269505 Year
» 1153886 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5809 27/07/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31279 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/227/07/1961
31/107/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 310
Cost when Built £
To Service 27/07/1961
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 27/07/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 23/04/1966
82A Bristol Bath Road 9w/e 16/10/1971
81A Old Oak Common w/e 08/01/1972
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 11/11/1972
OC Old Oak Common w/e 12/05/1973
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 09/03/1974
OC Old Oak Common w/e 11/05/1974
MR March 2w/e 11/10/1975
91E To Eastern Region w/e 11/10/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
07/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/07/1961 To Service To service as D5809
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 310
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
07/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31279    
12/05/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
09/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    

prev prev