Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3773 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17179 Week
» 70195 Month
» 189722 Year
» 3216575 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5810 |
03/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31280 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
03/08/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/08/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5810 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 311 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
25/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
06/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31280 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
24/10/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31280 |
|
|
02/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|