Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5810 03/08/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31280 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/203/08/1961
31/104/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 311
Cost when Built £
To Service 03/08/1961
Withdrawn 24/10/1988
Time in Service 27 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 02/1991
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 03/08/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 23/04/1966
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 11/11/1972
51L Thornaby w/e 25/11/1972
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 06/01/1973
YK York (North) 2w/e 12/10/1974
IM Immingham 2w/e 11/01/1975
   Withdrawn 24/10/1988

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/08/1961 To Service To service as D5810
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 311
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
04/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
25/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31280    
06/01/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
12/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
11/01/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
24/10/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 31280    
02/1991 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev