Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2618 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16024 Week
» 69040 Month
» 188567 Year
» 3215420 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5810 |
on |
07/08/1933 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
58xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
279 |
To Service |
Mon 07/08/1933 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/01/1959 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
07/08/1933 |
CNYD |
|
Croes Newydd |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/01/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1959 |
Swindon Works (Scrapyard) |
Scrapyard1401/23/9/37/56/7/57, 2254, 2812/23/5/30/3, 4200/26/61, 4377, 4540/53/84, 5315/55/82/6/8/90, 5566, 5703/8/33/43, 5810, 6318/22/8/31/4/54, 6409/28, 6721/3/7/43, 7738. |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/08/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5810 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Croes Newydd (CNYD) |
|
|
05/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5810 |
|
|
08/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|