Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5811 24/08/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31281 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/224/08/1961
31/103/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 312
Cost when Built £
To Service 24/08/1961
Withdrawn 15/05/1989
Time in Service 27 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 02/1990
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 24/08/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
2E Saltley w/e 20/03/1965
41C Wath w/e 27/03/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 23/04/1966
41C Wath w/e 06/08/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
52A Gateshead w/e 02/09/1972
41A Tinsley w/e 07/10/1972
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 11/11/1972
51L Thornaby w/e 25/11/1972
55A Holbeck (MR) 2w/e 10/03/1973
YK York (North) w/e 26/10/1974
IM Immingham 2w/e 11/01/1975
HM Healey Mills m/e 30/11/1979
   Withdrawn 15/05/1989

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/08/1961 To Service To service as D5811
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 312
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
20/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
03/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
02/09/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
25/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31281    
10/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
26/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
11/01/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
30/11/1979 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM)    
15/05/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 31281    
02/1990 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev