Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1451 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14857 Week
» 67873 Month
» 187400 Year
» 3214253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5813 |
07/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31282 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
07/09/1961 |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
02/1968 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
30/11/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
31/05/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/09/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
31/05/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5813 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 314 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
30/11/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
31/05/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
07/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31282 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
17/01/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31282 |
|
|
12/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|