Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 704 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1651 Week
» 20433 Month
» 268726 Year
» 1153107 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5814 14/09/1961
TOPS (31/4) 31414 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/214/09/1961
31/106/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 315
Cost when Built £
To Service 14/09/1961
Withdrawn 01/02/1999
Time in Service 37 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 14/09/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
91M To London Midland Region w/e 19/06/1965
41C Wath w/e 03/07/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 23/04/1966
41C Wath w/e 06/08/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
81A Old Oak Common w/e 08/01/1972
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 11/11/1972
81A Old Oak Common w/e 24/03/1973
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 01/02/1999

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
06/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
12/1971   Dual AWS Fitted  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/09/1961 To Service To service as D5814
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 315
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
03/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
06/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/1971 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
11/01/1972 Sightings Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common RO 517 Link
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31414    
24/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
01/02/1999 Withdrawn Condemned as 31414    

prev prev