Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 839 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 839 Week
» 12132 Month
» 276765 Year
» 1498330 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5815 m/e 08/1933

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 58xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-4-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 279
To Service During 08/1933
Withdrawal Thu 27/04/1961
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1933
84D Leamington 8w/e 20/04/1957
84C Banbury 4w/e 22/02/1958
82C Swindon 4w/e 19/04/1958
   Withdrawn on 27/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 19/04/1958
WDN   m/e 30/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1933 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5815
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 5815    

prev prev