Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5816 28/09/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31284 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/228/09/1961
31/103/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 317
Cost when Built £
To Service 28/09/1961
Withdrawn 30/08/1989
Time in Service 27 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 10/1991
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 28/09/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 23/04/1966
41C Wath w/e 06/08/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
31B March w/e 11/11/1972
TE Thornaby w/e 09/03/1974
TI Tinsley w/e 18/05/1974
IM Immingham 2w/e 11/01/1975
   Withdrawn 30/08/1989

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/09/1961 To Service To service as D5816
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 317
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
03/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31284    
09/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
18/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
11/01/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
30/08/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 31284    
10/1991 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev