Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 524 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 21213 Month
» 269506 Year
» 1153887 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5818 12/10/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31286 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/212/10/1961
31/107/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 319
Cost when Built £
To Service 12/10/1961
Withdrawn 20/12/1991
Time in Service 30 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 12/2001
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 12/10/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
81A Old Oak Common w/e 08/01/1972
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 11/11/1972
OC Old Oak Common 4w/e 08/11/1975
TE Thornaby w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 20/12/1991

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
07/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
05/1974   Dual Braked  
04/1976   Dual AWS Removed  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/10/1961 To Service To service as D5818
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 319
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
07/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31286    
05/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
08/11/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
04/1976 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
20/12/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31286    
12/2001 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury    

prev prev