Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 173 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1272 Week
» 7406 Month
» 235290 Year
» 1456855 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5819 19/10/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 31287 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/219/10/1961
31/104/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 320
To Service 19/10/1961
Withdrawn 09/09/1987
Time in Service 25 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 10/1989
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 19/10/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
GD Gateshead w/e 11/05/1974
TE Thornaby 3w/e 10/05/1975
   Withdrawn 09/09/1987

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/05/1968
ALLOC GD Gateshead q/e 29/06/1974

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/10/1961 To Service To service as D5819
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 320
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
04/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31287    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GD)    
10/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
09/09/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 31287    
10/1989 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev