Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5821 02/11/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31289 26/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/202/11/1961
31/108/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 322
Cost when Built £
To Service 02/11/1961
Withdrawn 01/03/1992
Time in Service 30 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 02/11/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 04/12/1965
91M To London Midland Region w/e 11/12/1965
91E To Eastern Region w/e 25/12/1965
41C Wath w/e 01/01/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
52A Gateshead w/e 02/09/1972
BS Bescot w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 01/03/1992

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
08/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/11/1961 To Service To service as D5821
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 322
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
11/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
08/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
02/09/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 31289    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (BS)    
01/03/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 31289    

prev prev