Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5822 09/11/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31290 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/209/11/1961
31/104/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 323
Cost when Built £
To Service 09/11/1961
Withdrawn 04/02/2000
Time in Service 38 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 07/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 09/11/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 19/05/1973
TI Tinsley w/e 03/11/1973
GD Gateshead w/e 11/05/1974
TE Thornaby 2w/e 11/01/1975
   Withdrawn 04/02/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/11/1961 To Service To service as D5822
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 323
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
04/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31290    
19/05/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
03/11/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GD)    
11/01/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
04/02/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31290    
07/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev