Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 215 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 215 Week
» 11786 Month
» 260079 Year
» 1144460 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5823 16/11/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31291 24/11/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/216/11/1961
31/106/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 324
Cost when Built £
To Service 16/11/1961
Cut Up 01/2010
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 16/11/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 08/01/1972
OC Old Oak Common w/e 27/04/1974
MR March 2w/e 11/10/1975
91E To Eastern Region w/e 11/10/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
06/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
08/1972   Dual AWS Fitted  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/11/1961 To Service To service as D5823
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 324
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Doncaster shed. SLS 1/1962 Link
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
06/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
08/1972 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31291    
27/04/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
01/2010 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev