Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4061 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17467 Week
» 70483 Month
» 190010 Year
» 3216863 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5824 |
23/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31415 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
23/11/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
04/08/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/08/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
25/08/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/08/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/11/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
04/08/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
25/08/1973 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 04/1977 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5824 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 325 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
05/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
04/08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
04/08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
25/08/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
25/08/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31415 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
01/07/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31415 |
|
|
06/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|