Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3621 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17027 Week
» 70043 Month
» 189570 Year
» 3216423 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5825 |
30/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31292 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
30/11/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/05/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/11/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
02/05/1969 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5825 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 326 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
10/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/05/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
14/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31292 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
07/02/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31292 |
|
|
09/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|