Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 522 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2429 Week
» 21211 Month
» 269504 Year
» 1153885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5826 07/12/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31293 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/207/12/1961
31/108/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 07/12/1961
Withdrawn 09/11/1990
Time in Service 28 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 02/1994
Cut At Coopers Metals (at Stratford MPD)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 07/12/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 08/01/1972
OC Old Oak Common 2w/e 08/03/1975
BR Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 08/11/1975
   Withdrawn 09/11/1990

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
08/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
09/1972   Dual AWS Fitted  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/12/1961 To Service To service as D5826
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
08/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
29/06/1969 Sightings Finsbury Park depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
09/1972 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31293    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
08/11/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
09/11/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 31293    
02/1994 Scrapped Broken up by Coopers Metals: at Stratford MPD    

prev prev