Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5827 14/12/1961
TOPS (Tops) 31294 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/214/12/1961
31/105/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 14/12/1961
Withdrawn 04/02/2000
Time in Service 38 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys
Cut Up 07/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 14/12/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
2E Saltley w/e 02/10/1965
91M To London Midland Region w/e 09/10/1965
41C Wath w/e 23/10/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 08/01/1972
   Withdrawn 04/02/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
05/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
10/1972   Dual AWS Fitted  
05/1974   Dual Braked  
04/1976   Dual AWS Removed  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/12/1961 To Service To service as D5827
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
23/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
05/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/1972 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31294    
05/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
04/1976 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
04/02/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31294    
07/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev