Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 418 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1355 Week
» 8539 Month
» 316520 Year
» 1200901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5829 04/01/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31296 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/204/01/1962
31/102/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 04/01/1962
Withdrawn 01/12/1993
Time in Service 31 yrs, 10 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 01/2004
Cut At R Garrett (at Crewe LNWR)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 04/01/1962
41C Wath w/e 18/01/1964
91M To London Midland Region w/e 16/10/1965
41C Wath w/e 23/10/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
40B Immingham w/e 07/03/1970
TE Thornaby w/e 12/01/1974
BR Bristol Bath Road 3w/e 10/05/1975
   Withdrawn 01/12/1993

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
02/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
08/1969   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/01/1962 To Service To service as D5829
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
16/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
23/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
02/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
07/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31296    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
10/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
01/12/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 31296    
01/2004 Scrapped Broken up by R Garrett: at Crewe LNWR    

prev prev