Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5830 11/01/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31297 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/211/01/1962
31/110/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 11/01/1962
Withdrawn 01/02/1998
Time in Service 36 yrs , 21 dys
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 11/01/1962
41C Wath w/e 18/01/1964
2E Saltley w/e 12/06/1965
41C Wath w/e 03/07/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
TE Thornaby w/e 11/05/1974
   Withdrawn 01/02/1998

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/01/1962 To Service To service as D5830
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
03/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
10/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31297    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
01/02/1998 Withdrawn Condemned as 31297    

prev prev