Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 529 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2436 Week
» 21218 Month
» 269511 Year
» 1153892 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5831 18/01/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31298 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/218/01/1962
31/110/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/01/1962
Withdrawn 06/07/1987
Time in Service 25 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys
Cut Up 11/1989
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 18/01/1962
41C Wath w/e 18/01/1964
41C Wath w/e 05/06/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn 06/07/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/01/1962 To Service To service as D5831
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
05/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
10/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31298    
06/07/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 31298    
11/1989 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev