Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 94 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3693 Week
» 9827 Month
» 237711 Year
» 1459276 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5832 01/02/1962  
TOPS (Tops) 31299 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/201/02/1962
31/118/11/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 01/02/1962
Withdrawn 10/10/1990
Time in Service 28 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 02/2001
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Stratford MPD)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 01/02/1962
41C Wath w/e 18/01/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
TE Thornaby w/e 18/05/1974
TI Tinsley 3w/e 12/07/1975
   Withdrawn 10/10/1990

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
18/11/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31      


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/02/1962 To Service To service as D5832
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
26/09/1964 Sightings Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing John Thickitt Link
18/11/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31299    
18/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
12/07/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
10/10/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 31299    
02/2001 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Stratford MPD    

prev prev