Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 705 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1652 Week
» 20434 Month
» 268727 Year
» 1153108 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5833 15/02/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31300 18/12/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/215/02/1962
31/111/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 15/02/1962
Withdrawn 01/05/1997
Time in Service 35 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 10/2002
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 15/02/1962
41C Wath w/e 18/01/1964
2E Saltley (on loan) w/e 18/09/1965
41C Wath w/e 09/10/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
TE Thornaby w/e 18/05/1974
TI Tinsley 3w/e 12/07/1975
   Withdrawn 01/05/1997

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/02/1962 To Service To service as D5833
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
18/09/1965 Allocation Loaned to Saltley (2E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
11/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31300    
18/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
12/07/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
01/05/1997 Withdrawn Condemned as 31300    
10/2002 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev