Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2301 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20104 Week
» 73120 Month
» 192647 Year
» 3219500 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5833 |
15/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31300 |
18/12/1973 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31445 |
13/06/1984 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31545 |
07/06/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
15/02/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/02/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/02/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5833 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
11/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
18/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31300 |
|
|
18/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
13/06/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31445 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
07/06/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31545 |
|
|
01/05/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31545 |
|
|
10/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|