Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 393 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6202 Week
» 13386 Month
» 321367 Year
» 1205748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5834 01/03/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31301 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/201/03/1962
31/110/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 01/03/1962
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 01/03/1962
41C Wath w/e 18/01/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 18/03/1967
40B Immingham w/e 07/03/1970
TI Tinsley 2w/e 07/07/1973

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
04/1969   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    
01/03/1962 To Service To service as D5834
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
10/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
18/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
04/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
07/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31301    
07/07/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    

prev prev