Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1547 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14953 Week
» 67969 Month
» 187496 Year
» 3214349 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5835 |
26/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31302 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
26/04/1962 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/07/1962 |
|
Uprated to 2,000 h.p. |
|
|
|
|
04/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
31/12/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/08/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/04/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/08/1978 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5835 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: Uprated to 2,000 h.p. |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
26/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31302 |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
31/12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/08/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|
14/01/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31302 |
|
|