Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5836 12/04/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31303 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/212/04/1962
31/101/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 12/04/1962
Withdrawn 01/01/1996
Time in Service 33 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 12/2005
Cut At Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 12/04/1962
41C Wath w/e 18/01/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
51L Thornaby 2w/e 10/03/1973
TI Tinsley 3w/e 12/07/1975
   Withdrawn 01/01/1996

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
01/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/04/1962 To Service To service as D5836
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
01/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31303    
10/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
12/07/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
01/01/1996 Withdrawn Condemned as 31303    
12/2005 Scrapped Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham    

prev prev