Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 415 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1352 Week
» 8536 Month
» 316517 Year
» 1200898 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5837 19/04/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31304 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/219/04/1962
31/110/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 19/04/1962
Withdrawn 14/01/2000
Time in Service 37 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 07/1999
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 19/04/1962
41C Wath w/e 07/03/1964
41C Wath w/e 31/07/1965
40B Immingham w/e 11/05/1968
41A Tinsley w/e 07/03/1970
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 08/01/1972
OC Old Oak Common 4w/e 10/05/1975
SF Stratford w/e 15/05/1988
IM Immingham 22/05/1988
   Withdrawn 14/01/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
10/1972   Dual AWS Fitted  
07/1974   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/04/1962 To Service To service as D5837
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
31/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
10/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/1972 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31304    
07/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
10/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
22/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
07/1999 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    
14/01/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31304    

prev prev