Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 526 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2433 Week
» 21215 Month
» 269508 Year
» 1153889 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5839 03/05/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31306 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/203/05/1962
31/102/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 03/05/1962
Cut Up 11/2006
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 03/05/1962
41C Wath w/e 07/03/1964
2E Saltley w/e 17/07/1965
41C Wath w/e 24/07/1965
40B Immingham w/e 11/05/1968
41A Tinsley w/e 07/03/1970
TE Thornaby w/e 11/05/1974
TI Tinsley w/e 06/07/1974
SF Stratford w/e 15/05/1988

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
02/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/05/1962 To Service To service as D5839
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
17/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
02/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31306    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
06/07/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
11/2006 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Old Oak Common MPD    

prev prev