Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 88 Today
» 1336 Yesterday
» 3861 Week
» 3861 Month
» 192996 Year
» 1414561 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5840 10/05/1962  
TOPS (Tops) 31307 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/210/05/1962
31/113/11/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 10/05/1962
Withdrawn 01/03/1996
Time in Service 33 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 02/2005
Cut At Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 10/05/1962
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
TI Tinsley 3w/e 10/05/1975
   Withdrawn 01/03/1996

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/1970   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/05/1962 To Service To service as D5840
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
11/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31307    
10/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
01/03/1996 Withdrawn Condemned as 31307    
02/2005 Scrapped Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham    

prev prev