Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1023 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3122 Week
» 14693 Month
» 262986 Year
» 1147367 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5841 17/05/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31308 12/12/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/217/05/1962
31/103/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 17/05/1962
Cut Up 12/2006
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 17/05/1962
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
91M To London Midland Region w/e 21/08/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 28/08/1965
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 07/10/1972
MR March w/e 19/01/1974
TI Tinsley w/e 06/07/1974
YK York (North) 2w/e 12/10/1974
TI Tinsley w/e 08/03/1975
SF Stratford w/e 15/05/1988


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/05/1962 To Service To service as D5841
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
26/09/1964 Sightings Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Double-heading coke hoppers - Double heading coke hoppers with D5841. These Orgreave Sidings to Appleby-Frodingham coke trains were rostered for Tinsley (41A) Type 2s'. A heavy train, the coke was produced at Orgreave Coking Plant and burnt in the Scunthorpe blast furnaces. The passage of these trains was a frequent event, as they ran mornings and afternoons on weekdays. - with D5852 John Thickitt Link
21/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
28/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31308    
19/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
06/07/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
12/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
12/2006 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Old Oak Common MPD    

prev prev