Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5845 14/06/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31311 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/214/06/1962
31/108/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 14/06/1962
Withdrawn 07/02/1989
Time in Service 26 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys
Cut Up 12/1989
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 14/06/1962
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
91M To London Midland Region w/e 28/08/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 25/09/1965
51L Thornaby w/e 11/11/1972
   Withdrawn 07/02/1989

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1970   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
16/11/1963 Not severe   Not known Not known    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/06/1962 To Service To service as D5845
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
28/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
25/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
10/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31311    
07/02/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 31311    
12/1989 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev