Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1834 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19637 Week
» 72653 Month
» 192180 Year
» 3219033 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5846 |
21/06/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31312 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
21/06/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/11/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
27/03/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
27/03/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
01/12/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5846 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31312 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
14/01/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31312 |
|
|
11/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|