Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5849 12/07/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31315 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/212/07/1962
31/104/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 12/07/1962
Withdrawn 01/04/1998
Time in Service 35 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 07/2006
Cut At Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 12/07/1962
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
30A Stratford w/e 03/04/1971
40B Immingham w/e 09/10/1971
31B March w/e 07/10/1972
   Withdrawn 01/04/1998

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
31/12/1963 Not severe   Train heating boiler burners Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/07/1962 To Service To service as D5849
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31315    
01/04/1998 Withdrawn Condemned as 31315    
07/2006 Scrapped Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham    

prev prev