Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 153 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 153 Week
» 18935 Month
» 267228 Year
» 1151609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5850 18/07/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31316 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/218/07/1962
31/104/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/07/1962
Withdrawn 01/11/1995
Time in Service 33 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 04/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 18/07/1962
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 29/05/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 10/07/1965
30A Stratford w/e 03/04/1971
55B York (North) w/e 09/10/1971
51L Thornaby w/e 08/01/1972
YK York (North) w/e 12/01/1974
HO Holbeck (MR) 2w/e 11/10/1975
   Withdrawn 01/11/1995


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/07/1962 To Service To service as D5850
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
10/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31316    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
01/11/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31316    
04/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev