Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 524 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18327 Week
» 71343 Month
» 190870 Year
» 3217723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5851 |
26/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31317 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
26/07/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Snowplough brackets removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/07/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5851 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31317 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets removed |
|
|
10/03/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
05/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|