Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5851 26/07/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31317 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/226/07/1962
31/109/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 26/07/1962
Cut Up 05/2000
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 26/07/1962
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
2E Saltley w/e 03/04/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 10/04/1965
40B Immingham w/e 15/05/1965
31B March w/e 11/09/1965
IM Immingham 2w/e 10/03/1979

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
09/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
26/07/1962 To Service To service as D5851
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
15/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31317    
10/03/1979 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
05/2000 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev