Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 707 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1654 Week
» 20436 Month
» 268729 Year
» 1153110 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5852 02/08/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31318 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/202/08/1962
31/111/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 02/08/1962
Withdrawn 01/03/1996
Time in Service 33 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 09/1998
Cut At MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 02/08/1962
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
40B Immingham w/e 10/07/1965
MR March 2w/e 12/10/1974
   Withdrawn 01/03/1996

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
12/1982   Boiler Isolated  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/08/1962 To Service To service as D5852
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
26/09/1964 Sightings Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Double-heading coke hoppers - Double heading coke hoppers with D5841. These Orgreave Sidings to Appleby-Frodingham coke trains were rostered for Tinsley (41A) Type 2s'. A heavy train, the coke was produced at Orgreave Coking Plant and burnt in the Scunthorpe blast furnaces. The passage of these trains was a frequent event, as they ran mornings and afternoons on weekdays. - with D5841 John Thickitt Link
10/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31318    
12/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
12/1982 Modification Modification: Boiler Isolated    
01/03/1996 Withdrawn Condemned as 31318    
09/1998 Scrapped Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works    

prev prev