Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 526 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2433 Week
» 21215 Month
» 269508 Year
» 1153889 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5853 23/08/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31319 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/223/08/1962
31/101/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 23/08/1962
Withdrawn 30/04/2007
Time in Service 44 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys
Cut Up 06/2007
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 23/08/1962
31B March w/e 15/09/1962
40A Lincoln w/e 31/08/1963
34G Finsbury Park w/e 14/09/1963
40B Immingham w/e 09/01/1965
YK York (North) 2w/e 12/10/1974
HO Holbeck (MR) 2w/e 11/10/1975
   Withdrawn 30/04/2007

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
01/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/08/1962 To Service To service as D5853
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31319    
12/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
30/04/2007 Withdrawn Condemned as 31319    
06/2007 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev