Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 123 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17926 Week
» 70942 Month
» 190469 Year
» 3217322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5856 |
30/08/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31417 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
30/08/1962 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
22/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/08/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
22/12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5856 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
21/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
22/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
13/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31417 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
30/11/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31417 |
|
|
01/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|