Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 717 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1664 Week
» 20446 Month
» 268739 Year
» 1153120 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5862 25/10/1962
TOPS (Tops) 31327 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/225/10/1962
31/103/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 25/10/1962
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 25/10/1962
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
40B Immingham w/e 05/03/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 07/03/1970
IM Immingham w/e 10/11/1973

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
11/12/1971   Dual Braked  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/10/1962 To Service To service as D5862
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
29/04/1965 Sightings An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station John Thickitt - station visit Link
03/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
11/12/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31327    
10/11/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    

prev