Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5900   03/1931

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1931 HINDERTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1931
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Service Life 32 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84E Tyseley 4w/e 21/03/1953
84B Oxley 4w/e 03/12/1955
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 03/11/1962
82B St Philips Marsh 2w/e 17/11/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WES Westbury 4w/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 2w/e 17/11/1962
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1931 To Service To service as GWR Number 5900, name: HINDERTON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5900    

prev prev